THOMAS LANGLEYS CHARITY (INCLUDING THE POORS STOCK)

Charity number: 219354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £51 £54 £54 £55 £57
Total expenditure £45 £45 £65 £65 £65
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A