THE BLOCKLEY CHARITY

Charity number: 219463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required