Accounts and annual returns JUNIOR FREEMENS FUND

Charity number: 219553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 April 2024 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 April 2024 540 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 April 2024 905 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1361 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1361 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1727 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1727 days