Financial history JUNIOR FREEMENS FUND

Charity number: 219553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.21k £1.32k £864 £877 £895
Total expenditure £1.04k £1.05k £797 £826 £786
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A