ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ELIZABETH BUXTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate, ie, at Winster School (books?).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 December 1963: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.45k | £17 | £17 | £17 | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £20 | £20 | £20 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 21 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 11 JULY 1730 AND ORDER OF 31 MARCH 1896
Charitable objects
1) PAYMENTS TO THE CURATE FOR THE TIME BEING AND HIS SUCCESSORS FOR PREACHING A SERMON OF REMEMBERANCE ON THE ANNIVERSARY OF THE DAY OF ELIZABETH BUXTON'S BURIAL, AND ALSO TO PREACH A SERMON ON THE ANNIVERSARY OF THE BURIAL OF HER MOTHER, ANNE BUXTON, AND HER AUNT, ELIZABETH ASHMORE. PAYMENTS TO BE MADE TO THE BELL RINGERS ON THE SAME DAYS. 2) TWO BIBLES TO BE AWARDED TO TWO POOR SCHOLARS OF WINSTON FREE-SCHOOL AS THE MASTER SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WINSTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window