MANSFIELD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 219611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 April 2020 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required