MANSFIELD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 219611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £418 £425 £2.18k £1.09k £1.35k
Total expenditure £570 £360 £340 £430 £927
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A