SIM INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 219763
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 August 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 04 August 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download