Financial history KINGSTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 219819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.37k £9.86k £9.27k £14.30k £4.95k
Total expenditure £21.78k £17.76k £14.25k £20.02k £7.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A