THE CHARLTON AND LINLEY HOMES

Charity number: 219825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 January 2021 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 January 2021 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 January 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 January 2020 05 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 January 2019 12 November 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 January 2019 12 November 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 05 January 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 January 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 January 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2017 On time Download