THE CHARLTON AND LINLEY HOMES

Charity number: 219825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/01/2017 05/01/2018 05/01/2019 05/01/2020 05/01/2021
Total gross income £29.75k £28.75k £27.28k £26.75k £30.86k
Total expenditure £15.16k £26.51k £23.90k £26.56k £47.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A