Accounts and annual returns SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD COUNCIL OF SOCIAL SERVICE

Charity number: 219937
Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 548 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 913 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 913 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1278 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1278 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1644 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1644 days