THE BRITISH INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF IRAQ (GERTRUDE BELL MEMORIAL)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BISI promotes, supports and undertakes research in Iraq and neighbouring countries in archaeology, history, anthropology, geography, language and other related domains from the earliest times until the present. It publishes an academic journal, IRAQ, a bi-annual newsletter and monographs. BISI organizes lectures, study days and other events relating to Iraq and sponsors visiting Iraqi scholars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Iraq
- Jordan
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
- 18 March 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 March 2011: Funds transferred to 1135395 THE BRITISH INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF IRAQ (GERTR...
- BISI (Working name)
- BRITISH SCHOOL OF ARCHAEOLOGY IN IRAQ (GERTRUDE BELL MEMORIAL) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.68k | £141.39k | £293.12k | £155.62k | £126.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.48k | £106.39k | £103.66k | £118.42k | £122.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 14 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 04 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 04 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 03 October 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATIONS DATED 14 JANUARY 1932 AS AMENDED 6 DECEMBER 2001 AND 12 DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RESEARCH AND PUBLIC EDUCATION RELATING TO IRAQ AND THE NEIGHBOURING COUNTRIES IN ANTHROPOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOGRAPHY, PHILOLOGY AND RELATED DISCIPLINES WITHIN THE ARTS, HUMANITIES AND SOCIAL SCIENCES
Area of benefit
IRAQ AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTRIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window