Accounts and annual returns JOHN CHAPMAN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 219979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required