Financial history JOHN CHAPMAN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 219979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.72k £1.74k £1.78k £1.81k £1.85k
Total expenditure £1.95k £1.75k £1.80k £0 £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A