Trustees CLAIRE WAND FUND
Charity number: 220008
Charity reporting is overdue by 552 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID SILVER | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr SAMIRA ANANE | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Michael Ingram | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Richard Mark Vautrey | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Oluwadamilola Adedayo | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr RJ Walshaw | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr NICHOLAS SILVER | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
DR JOHN RAWLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr JANE WAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.