PLYMOUTH HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 220010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £28.72k £31.69k £32.21k £48.15k £40.02k
Total expenditure £28.29k £41.50k £32.26k £42.51k £28.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £3.00k