JOHN FRICKER'S CHARITY OF 1696

Charity number: 220019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £40.21k £39.69k £39.70k £39.90k £39.61k
Total expenditure £36.13k £35.90k £36.05k £26.79k £20.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A