ST CLEMENTS PARISH PROPERTY

Charity number: 220051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN MARY JANE CARSTAIRS Trustee 24 February 2015 None on record
Ravi Knight Trustee 10 October 2019 None on record
KAY RUMFORD Trustee 16 December 2016 None on record
Rev Rachel Elisabeth Gibson Chair 01 September 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CLEMENT'S, OXFORD Received: On time
SIMEON'S TRUSTEES Received: On time
THE GRIMSHAW TRUST Received: On time
MISS CATHERINE E HYNDMANS BOUNTY INCLUDING THE DOROTHY PROCTOR GIFT Received: On time
THE GOLDESBOROUGH BEQUEST Received: On time
SIMON JOHN LIVINGSTONE Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record