ST DAVID'S HOME FOR DISABLED SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND AIRMEN

Charity number: 220151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Robinson Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
CHRIS GOSS Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Prof Jean McEwan Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Gemma Page Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Rev TIMOTHY CHARLES RICHARD HUTTON Trustee 23 January 2013
GIFTS4LIVING Received: On time
DAVID SEARLE Trustee 18 July 2015 None on record
Sue Pillar-Lea Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record