Dogfen lywodraethu KING EDWARD VI ALMSHOUSE, SCHOOL AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY, AT LOUTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 07/08/1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2016 as amended on 26 Dec 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) PAYMENT OF A YEARLY SUM OF ú70 TO THE CHARITY CALLED DERELICT LANDS.2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY.3) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF ALMSHOUSES.4) PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.5) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Maes buddion
PARISHES OF NORTH SOMERCOTES AND SOUTH SOMERCOTES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.