HAMMERTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 220188
Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days