THE FEOFFEES OF CHERTSEY MARKET

Charity number: 220202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of persons resident in the 'Ancient Parish of Chertsey' who are in need, hardship or distress. Assistance is nearly always provided via another Charity or Relief organisation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,593
Total expenditure: £6,160

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FEOFFEES OF CHERTSEY MARKET (Working name)
  • THE MARKET AND FAIR CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DOLSIE CLARKE Trustee 07 March 2017
CHERTSEY COMBINED CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN RAYMOND Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record
Mark Nuti Trustee 15 August 2014
HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Ron Enticott Trustee 16 October 2013
ONE TO ONE (NORTH WEST SURREY)
Received: On time
AID IN MEDICARE & EDUCATION
Received: On time
David John Wareham Trustee 14 August 2000
S.A. OLIVER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE HOCKEY YOUTH TRUST
Received: 55 days late
THE ROBERT MEDHURST BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
OLD MASONIANS BENEVOLENT AND GRANT FUND
Received: On time
DEREK COTTY Trustee
CHERTSEY COMBINED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.57k £8.72k £7.60k £9.53k £12.59k
Total expenditure £17.04k £25.24k £4.12k £27.21k £6.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 ABBEY ROAD
CHERTSEY
KT16 8AL
Phone:
01932848408
Website:

No information available