Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 220218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window