PEOPLE'S THEATRE ARTS GROUP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities pertaining to the operation of an Arts Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 26 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John De'Ath | Chair | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Megan Smith | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Cooper | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Joy Worswick | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Swinton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Hope | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Patricia Heckels-Thompson | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara-Jo Harrison | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MURRAY APPLEBY | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr PHILIP MARTIN BRADLEY | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY CHILDS | Trustee |
|
||||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £620.18k | £298.34k | £129.96k | £292.42k | £313.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.17k | £289.67k | £206.43k | £241.53k | £266.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.18k | £61.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £59.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £382.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £177.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £670 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £315.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £46.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £16.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 June 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 June 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 OCTOBER 1929 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1953 AND 20 DECEMBER 1962
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEOPLE'S THEATRE
STEPHENSON ROAD
HEATON
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 5QF
- Phone:
- 0191 275 9875
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window