ANTHROPOSOPHICAL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 220364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 December 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 December 2020 33 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 June 2017 On time Download