Trustees ANTHROPOSOPHICAL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 220364
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARJATTA VAN BOESCHOTEN Chair 06 June 2013
ANTHROPOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN GREAT BRITAIN
Overdue by 35 days
Antoinette Reynolds Trustee 16 May 2020
ANTHROPOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN GREAT BRITAIN
Overdue by 35 days
Christiana Thekla Aurelia Bryan Trustee 14 June 2019
ANTHROPOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN GREAT BRITAIN
Overdue by 35 days
Marilyn Anne Edwards Trustee 05 September 2018
CALDER VALLEY STEINER EDUCATION LTD.
Received: On time
Adrian Mark Locher Trustee 29 November 2013
ANTHROPOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN GREAT BRITAIN
Overdue by 35 days
THE PURIE-HARWELL TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON HENRY BLAXLAND-DE LANGE Trustee 17 October 2013
ANTHROPOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN GREAT BRITAIN
Overdue by 35 days