Elm Trees Retirement Living Limited

Charity number: 220392
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 June 2016 On time Download