Elm Trees Retirement Living Limited

Charity number: 220392
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TREVOR BIDDLE Trustee 21 December 2011 None on record
EMMA BURNS Trustee 17 October 2011 None on record
Susan Elizabeth Love Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
MICHAEL MITCHELL Trustee 21 December 2011 None on record
James West Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
Jeanann Giles Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record