ST NEOT UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 220401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.14k £1.16k £1.16k £1.31k £1.57k
Total expenditure £1.10k £1.33k £1.00k £960 £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A