ST NEOT UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 220401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Ball Trustee 16 November 2018 None on record
Fernley Rowe Trustee None on record
Poppy Crichton Trustee 16 November 2018 None on record
Havilind Bunt Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Charles Henry James Masters Trustee 07 December 2014 None on record
Graham John Kent Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record
MR MARTIN EDDY Trustee None on record
Tracey Ann Hooper Trustee 08 July 2020 None on record
Dee Towers Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record