Financial history CHRISTIAN POLICE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.15k £133.80k £120.17k £109.17k £128.29k
Total expenditure £129.74k £121.92k £127.89k £125.39k £135.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A