Trustees CHRISTIAN POLICE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Akinlawon Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
Evans Chisala Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
GRAHAM NORMAN Trustee 16 July 2019
PARALLEL YOUTH ENTERPRISE
Received: On time
Heather Flanigan Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Philip Skedgell Trustee 12 November 2018
None on record
Graham Alder Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Katy Harding Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
Dave Valente Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
Mandy Godfrey Trustee 28 January 2017
None on record
Kirsty Banks-Lyon Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
Harry Pearson Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Marie Reavey Trustee 11 November 2014
None on record
Keith Evans Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record
PETER LITTLETON Trustee
None on record
MR CLIFF HARRIES Trustee
None on record
MARK WATTS Trustee
None on record