Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DOG AND CAT SHELTER AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 220506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 18 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 25 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window