THE LINNEAN SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 220509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Simon John Hiscock FLS Trustee 24 May 2012 None on record
Elaine Shaughnessy Trustee 22 May 2020
SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF NATURAL HISTORY Received: On time
Professor Alan Hildrew FLS Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Professor Maximilian Telford FLS Trustee 24 May 2019 None on record
Robert Blackhall-Miles Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Dr Natasha de Vere FLS Trustee 24 May 2019
BUMBLEBEE CONSERVATION TRUST Received: On time
Dr Charlotte Grezo FLS Trustee 22 May 2020 None on record
Dr Sandra Knapp Chair 17 January 2017
BOTANICAL SOCIETY OF BRITAIN AND IRELAND Received: On time
Philip Sadler Trustee 24 May 2021
ST BRIDE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr JOHN CHARLES DAVID FLS Trustee 27 May 2013 None on record
Dr Rich Boden Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Mathew Frith FLS Trustee 24 May 2019 None on record
Kevin Coutinho FLS Trustee 22 May 2020 None on record
Edward Joseph Banks FLS Trustee 22 May 2020
HERGEST TRUST Received: On time
Professor Anjali Goswami FLS Trustee 24 May 2019 None on record
Prof Brycchan Carey Trustee 24 May 2021
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR EIGHTEENTH-CENTURY STUDIES Received: On time
PROFESSOR MARK CHASE FRS FLS Trustee 15 April 2011 None on record
Angus McCullough QC FLS Trustee 22 May 2020 None on record
Professor Alistair Hetherington FLS Trustee 24 May 2019 None on record
Dr Mark Watson Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record