CHADDESDEN OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 220560
Charity reporting is overdue by 1695 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1330 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1330 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1695 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1695 days