DRONFIELD AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 220564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.96k £361 £403 £463 £197
Total expenditure £1.04k £1.53k £1.02k £619 £979
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A