Financial history GLOSSOP AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 220566
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.30k £9.98k £6.64k £1.18k £4.48k
Total expenditure £5.27k £5.51k £5.64k £3.11k £4.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A