SHIPLAKE PARISH CHURCHYARD FUND

Charity number: 220760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.32k £2.08k £4.17k £1.36k £2.95k
Total expenditure £2.19k £1.72k £4.18k £1.86k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A