THE HULL & EAST YORKSHIRE CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 220773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 December 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 December 2019 43 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download