Trustees THE HULL & EAST YORKSHIRE CENTRE FOR THE DEAF
Charity number: 220773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Barrett | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dorley | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Dawn Mason | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Harness | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Christopher Franklin | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Taylor | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stanley James Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Lyster Barwick | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Smedley | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Jean Simpson | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENRY ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J R BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MALCOLM TERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.