WELFARE OF AGED PERSONS, REST CENTRE

Charity number: 220823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.33k £4.25k £4.50k £5.36k £4.63k
Total expenditure £6.92k £6.13k £5.71k £4.49k £4.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A