SIR SAMUEL SCOTT OF YEWS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees policy is to make grants to or for the benefit of medical research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hermione Mary Stanford | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Felicity Annette Rice | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
CAMILLA NANCY WITHINGTON | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.83k | £104.54k | £205.09k | £146.32k | £154.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.14k | £221.07k | £1.25m | £240.20k | £303.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MARCH 1951
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Queen Anne Street
LONDON
W1G 9HY
- Phone:
- 02078022700
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window