THE MILITARY KNIGHTS OF WINDSOR WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND SUPERNUMARY KNIGHTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 220884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required