Dogfen lywodraethu THE LONDON AND MIDDLESEX RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES OF ASSOCIATION FOUNDED 1862. AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 1987 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 1989 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 1990 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 1991 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 1992 AS AMENDED ON 02 SEP 1995 AS AMENDED ON 02 SEP 2000 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2001 AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 04 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2007 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RIFLE SHOOTING WITHIN LONDON AND MIDDLESEX.
Maes buddion
SURREY, LONDON AND MIDDLESEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.