Financial history THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY

Charity number: 220949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £284.50m £243.30m £244.90m £305.90m £226.50m
Total expenditure £276.10m £243.90m £247.10m £295.30m £234.70m
Income from government contracts £54.20m £29.80m £32.30m £36.80m £37.20m
Income from government grants £33.70m £22.10m £36.40m £83.60m £29.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £159.70m £126.60m £114.80m £147.20m £111.70m
Income - Other trading activities £31.90m £32.70m £31.30m £20.50m £28.50m
Income - Charitable activities £87.90m £81.20m £95.90m £135.00m £83.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £300.00k £200.00k £200.00k £100.00k £0
Income - Other £4.70m £2.60m £2.70m £3.10m £2.40m
Income - Legacies £31.30m £38.50m £33.10m £31.60m £33.80m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £220.90m £190.60m £197.50m £245.90m £183.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £55.20m £53.30m £49.60m £49.40m £51.20m
Expenditure - Governance £1.10m £3.30m £2.60m £5.00m £2.50m
Expenditure - Grants institution £59.20m £37.50m £48.10m £94.00m £37.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0