Governance THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY

Charity number: 220949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 21 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 17 March 2017: Funds received from 1149309 CUMBRIA THIRD SECTOR CONSORTIUM
  • 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
  • 25 October 2019: Funds received from 1014779 SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH
  • 05 February 2020: Funds received from 1164791 IHG FOUNDATION (UK) TRUST
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 17 December 2020: Funds received from 253002 MISS M L WATTS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT OTHERWISE KNO...
  • 06 April 2021: Funds received from 1107165 SUPPORT FOR SIERRA LEONE
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 30 July 2021: Funds received from 1135280 ELECTRIC RAILWAY MUSEUM LIMITED
  • 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
  • 12 August 2022: Funds received from 1029794 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LANGPORT AND SOMERTON BENEVOLE...
  • 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1034844 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BANGOR BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 15 September 2022: Funds received from 1183684 UPLYME COMMUNITY SPONSORSHIP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRITISH RED CROSS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property