Trustees LEEDS CHURCH INSTITUTE (INCORPORATED)
Charity number: 220966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Sadgrove | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Canon Paul Dorian Maybury | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lydia Groenewald | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Anna Sophia Bland | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev. Dr. Joseph Domenic Cortis | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
PATRICIA JOSEPHINE SANDBACH | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Canon ANN DOROTHEA NICHOLL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.