SANDRIDGE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 220982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.91k £1.95k £1.99k
Total expenditure £2.35k £1.80k £2.50k £1.70k £2.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A