THE WILLIAM ELLIS CHARITY

Charity number: 220995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth Owen Davies Trustee 05 April 2018 None on record
NAOMI JONES Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
BETHAN WYN PARRY JONES Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Sion Aled Jones Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Sian Angharad Parry Trustee 03 December 2015 None on record